This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 09:01:42 (UTC).

Orlando Garcia v. Duquesne Properties, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Orlando Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Duquesne Properties, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11426

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendant

Duquesne Properties, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Duquesne Properties, LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Glen Mertens in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (jp) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Duquesne Properties, LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29595579 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Duquesne Properties, LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Glen Mertens in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (jp) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Duquesne Properties, LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29595579 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUQUESNE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clive Handy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock