This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:37:10 (UTC).

Garcia v. Belen-Bautista et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Belen-Bautista. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01613

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

Geronima S. Belen-Bautista

San Bruno Smoke Shop Inc.,

2901 San Bruno Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94134

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Centery for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cara Patricia Townsend

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine St., Ste. 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elliott Charles Montgomery

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark Dee Potter

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr.

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

18 #18

Main Document

17 #2

Declaration

17 #1

Declaration

17 #17

Main Document

16 #4

2019 Tax Return

16 #3

2020 Tax Return

16 #2

2021 Corporate Tax Return

16 #1

Application

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) Letter dated 5/3/2022 from Mohammed Hadeed, San Bruno Smoke Shop Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Geronima S. Belen-Bautista served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/19/2022. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. San Bruno Smoke Shop Inc., served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

10 #10

Main Document

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orlando Garcia.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Orlando Garcia re #17 Response ( Non Motion ) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Montgomery, Elliott) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE re #13 Order by Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Montgomery, Elliott) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with N bySan Bruno Smoke Shop Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 2021 Corporate Tax Return, #3 2020 Tax Return, #4 2019 Tax Return)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter dated 5/3/2022 from Mohammed Hadeed, San Bruno Smoke Shop Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Geronima S. Belen-Bautista served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/19/2022. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. San Bruno Smoke Shop Inc., served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 9/15/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orlando Garcia.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Geronima S. Belen-Bautista, San Bruno Smoke Shop Inc.,. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Orlando Garcia re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16991935.). Filed byOrlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cara Patricia Townsend

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elliott Charles Montgomery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Potter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Prathima Reddy Price