This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2021 at 08:48:19 (UTC).

Garcia-Torres v. Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdings Inc

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Garcia-Torres filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00809

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ana Rosa Garcia-Torres

Defendants

Merlin Entertainment Group U.S. Holdings Inc. a/k/a Merlin Entertainment Group d/b/a Midway Attractions, North America

Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdings Inc also known as Merlin Entertainment Group doing business as Midway Attractions North America

Merlin Entertainment Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth C Onyenah

Attorney at Law Office of Kenneth Onyenah & Assoc

8585 N Stemmons Frwy, Ste M25

Dallas, TX 75247

Defendant Attorney

Raymond B Albertson

Attorney at Meaders and Alfaro

2001 Bryan St, Suite 3625

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #12

Exhibit(s)

1 #11

Exhibit(s)

1 #10

Exhibit(s)

1 #9

Exhibit(s)

1 #8

Exhibit(s)

1 #7

Exhibit(s)

1 #6

Exhibit(s)

1 #5

Exhibit(s)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 3/28/2022 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/10/2021) (twd) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint Conference Report filed by Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdings Inc. (Albertson, Raymond) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to hold the conference required by Rule 26(f) within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court as required by that Rule. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/12/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merlin Entertainment Group U.S. Holdings Inc. a/k/a Merlin Entertainment Group d/b/a Midway Attractions, North America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Kirkbi Invest A/S, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Merlin Entertainments, LTD for Merlin Entertainment Group U.S. Holdings Inc. a/k/a Merlin Entertainment Group d/b/a Midway Attractions, North America. (Albertson, Raymond) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Merlin Entertainment Group U.S. Holdings Inc. a/k/a Merlin Entertainment Group d/b/a Midway Attractions, North America. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11774963) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s)) (Albertson, Raymond) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant