This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 07:28:03 (UTC).

Garcia et al v. The Professional Locksmith, Inc., an Illlinois Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Garcia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Professional Locksmith, Inc , an Illlinois Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00987

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Luis Garcia

Orlando Perez

Defendants

The Professional Locksmith, Inc., an Illlinois Corporation

Oron Nuriel, individually

Gal Drucker, individually

The Professional Locksmith, Inc.

Oron Nuriel

Gal Drucker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

Samuel David Engelson

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT LUIS GARCIA and ORLANDO PEREZ, on behalf of themselves, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown v. THE PROFESSIONAL LOCKSMITH, INC., an Illinois Corporation, ORON NURIEL, individually, and GAL DRUCKER, individually filed by Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19189201. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Luis Garcia, #2 Consent of Orlando Perez)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #1

Consent of Luis Garcia

1 #2

Consent of Orlando Perez

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 4/5/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 4/12/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report by Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the telephonic status hearing set for 4/12/2022 is vacated and reset to 6/9/2022 at 8:55 a.m., using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A joint status report in conformity with the Court's order of 3/15/2022 is to be filed on 6/2/2022. (mk) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez. Gal Drucker waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; Oron Nuriel waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; The Professional Locksmith, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Executed WOS Defendant Professional Locksmith Inc., #2 Executed WOS Defendant Oron Nuriel, #3 Executed WOS Defendnant Gal Drucker)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

8 #1

Executed WOS Defendant Professional Locksmith Inc.

8 #2

Executed WOS Defendant Oron Nuriel

8 #3

Executed WOS Defendnant Gal Drucker

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez. Gal Drucker waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; Oron Nuriel waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; The Professional Locksmith, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Executed WOS Defendant Professional Locksmith Inc., #2 Executed WOS Defendant Oron Nuriel, #3 Executed WOS Defendnant Gal Drucker)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the telephonic status hearing set for 4/12/2022 is vacated and reset to 6/9/2022 at 8:55 a.m., using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A joint status report in conformity with the Court's order of 3/15/2022 is to be filed on 6/2/2022. (mk) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report by Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 4/5/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 4/12/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT LUIS GARCIA and ORLANDO PEREZ, on behalf of themselves, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown v. THE PROFESSIONAL LOCKSMITH, INC., an Illinois Corporation, ORON NURIEL, individually, and GAL DRUCKER, individually filed by Luis Garcia, Orlando Perez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19189201. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Luis Garcia, #2 Consent of Orlando Perez)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel David Engelson