This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 08:35:01 (UTC).

Garcia et al v. Elite Property Service LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Garcia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Elite Property Service LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01848

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnathan Garcia

Brian Garcia

Isaias Martinez

Defendants

Elite Property Service LLC

911 Flood Guys LLC

Blucore Property Services LLC

Mountain Ridge Underground LLC

Safe T Pro's LLC

Turn Key Property Service LLC

A Jared McCabe

Julie McCabe

Jordyne McCabe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Saul Barrat

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Michael David Zoldan

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

 

Court Documents

19 #5

Proposed Order

19 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

19 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

19 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#19

(#19) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#18

(#18) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 911 Flood Guys LLC, Blucore Property Services LLC, Elite Property Service LLC, A Jared McCabe, Jordyne McCabe, Julie McCabe, Mountain Ridge Underground LLC, Safe T Pro's LLC, Turn Key Property Service LLC. (SST) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

17 #1

Affidavit

#17

(#17) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez against Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#16

(#16) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Turn Key Property Service on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#15

(#15) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Safe T Pros on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#14

(#14) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Mountain Ridge Underground on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#13

(#13) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Julie McCabe on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#12

(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Jordyne McCabe on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#11

(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Elite Property Service on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Blucore Property Services, LLC on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#9

(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon A. Jared McCabe on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon 911 Flood Guys, LLC on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 911 Flood Guys LLC, Blucore Property Services LLC, Elite Property Service LLC, A Jared McCabe, Jordyne McCabe, Julie McCabe, Mountain Ridge Underground LLC, Safe T Pro's LLC, Turn Key Property Service LLC. (SST) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez against Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Turn Key Property Service on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Safe T Pros on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Mountain Ridge Underground on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Julie McCabe on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Jordyne McCabe on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Elite Property Service on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon Blucore Property Services, LLC on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon A. Jared McCabe on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.7(A)(2); NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER REGARDING SERVICE upon 911 Flood Guys, LLC on 21.11.06. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on February 2, 2022. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/4/2021. (JAMA) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/4/2021. (JAMA) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to 911 Flood Guys LLC, Blucore Property Services LLC, Elite Property Service LLC, A Jared McCabe, Jordyne McCabe, Julie McCabe, Mountain Ridge Underground LLC, Safe T Pro's LLC, Turn Key Property Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20031370. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1848-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(MYE) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Pursuant to LRCiv 3.7(a)(2) by Brian Garcia, Johnathan Garcia, Isaias Martinez. (Barrat, Jason) (MYE) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20031370 filed by Johnathan Garcia, Brian Garcia, Isaias Martinez. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Saul Barrat