This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 08:35:33 (UTC).

Garcia et al v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Garcia filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Arizona, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine and Roslyn O Silver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01850

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah M Fine

Presiding Judge

Roslyn O Silver

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Audia Garcia

Eleana Garcia

Defendants

Arizona, State of

Jeff Hood

Walt Pesterfield

Isabel A Paz

Unknown Paz

Monica Medina

Dream Called Hope LLC

Phillip Parks

Unknown Parties

Tammy R Horne

Adobe Mountain School

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas Randolph Zanes

Attorney at Zanes Law

4222 E Thomas Rd., Ste. 100

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Jeffrey Howard Sadler

Attorney at Zanes Law

4222 E Thomas Rd., Ste. 100

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorneys

Neil Singh

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

Patrick Joseph Boyle

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

Kathleen L Wieneke

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group PLC

1095 W Rio Salado Pkwy., Ste. 209

Tempe, AZ 85281

Laura Anne Van Buren

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group PLC

1095 W Rio Salado Pkwy., Ste. 209

Tempe, AZ 85281

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-015582. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20034350 filed by Arizona, State of, Monica Medina, Jeff Hood, Walt Pesterfield. (Singh, Neil) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#3

(#3) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Isabel A Paz: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on November 3, 2021 to Isabel A. Paz . (Wieneke, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiffs must either serve the Complaint on the remaining unserved Defendants or seek a waiver of service for each of the remaining unserved Defendants. If Plaintiffs do not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on an unserved Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. The served named Defendants must answer the Complaint (Doc. #1 -3). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/05/2021. (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Laura Anne Van Buren. (Van Buren, Laura) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Jeffrey Howard Sadler. (Sadler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#7

(#7) *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Arizona, State of, Jeff Hood, Monica Medina, Walt Pesterfield. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, Neil) *Modified to correct event and text on 12/7/2021 (REK). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER granting the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadline to File Their Answer #7 . Defendants Hood, Medina, Pesterfield, Paz, and the State of Arizona have until January 18, 2022, to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 1/18/2022. (REK) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadline to File Their Answer #7 . Defendants Hood, Medina, Pesterfield, Paz, and the State of Arizona have until January 18, 2022, to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 1/18/2022. (REK) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Arizona, State of, Jeff Hood, Monica Medina, Walt Pesterfield. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, Neil) *Modified to correct event and text on 12/7/2021 (REK). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Jeffrey Howard Sadler. (Sadler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Laura Anne Van Buren. (Van Buren, Laura) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiffs must either serve the Complaint on the remaining unserved Defendants or seek a waiver of service for each of the remaining unserved Defendants. If Plaintiffs do not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on an unserved Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. The served named Defendants must answer the Complaint (Doc. #1 -3). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/05/2021. (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Isabel A Paz: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on November 3, 2021 to Isabel A. Paz . (Wieneke, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Return of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Lisa Fischer as Receptionist, on behalf of the State of Arizona on 10/18/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa Superior Court on 10/18/2021). Affidavit of Service re: Complaint/Not subject to Compulsory Arbitration/Summons upon Monica M Medina on 10/19/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa Superior Court on 10/20/2021). (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-015582. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20034350 filed by Arizona, State of, Monica Medina, Jeff Hood, Walt Pesterfield. (Singh, Neil) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Singh(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Joseph Boyle Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen L Wieneke