This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2021 at 07:10:13 (UTC).

Garcia-Dipini v. LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Garcia-Dipini filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LARRY PITT ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-02186

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Edna Garcia-Dipini

Defendant and Counter Claimant

LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

MARC A. WEINBERG

Attorney at SAFFREN AND WEINBERG

815 Greenwood Ave, Suite 22

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

One Penn Center, 1617 John F Kennedy Blvd Suite 1010

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, JULY 26, 2021, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C..(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 30, 2021. THE EXTENSION OF THIS DEADLINE IS LIMITED TO THE FILING OF AN ANSWER, AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE. THE PARTIES' STIPULATION IS THEREFORE APPROVED, IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/15/21. 6/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C. with Certificate of Service(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of 6/9/21 from Judge: Leeson's Chambers. Re: 10 Day Default Notice. (DT) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by George Phillips re: served Summons and Complaint upon Larry Pitt by Corporate on 05/15/2021 (WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#2

(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 5/13/21. 5/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15119517.), filed by Edna Garcia-Dipini.(WEINBERG, MARC) Modified on 5/13/2021 (fb). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, JULY 26, 2021, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C..(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 30, 2021. THE EXTENSION OF THIS DEADLINE IS LIMITED TO THE FILING OF AN ANSWER, AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE. THE PARTIES' STIPULATION IS THEREFORE APPROVED, IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/15/21. 6/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C. with Certificate of Service(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of 6/9/21 from Judge: Leeson's Chambers. Re: 10 Day Default Notice. (DT) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by George Phillips re: served Summons and Complaint upon Larry Pitt by Corporate on 05/15/2021 (WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 5/13/21. 5/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/13/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edna Garcia-Dipini. (JL ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15119517.), filed by Edna Garcia-Dipini.(WEINBERG, MARC) Modified on 5/13/2021 (fb). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less