This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2019 at 07:39:16 (UTC).

Garcia-Bengochea v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 Garcia-Bengochea filed an Other lawsuit against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom, James Lawrence King and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-23592

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

Presiding Judges

Beth Bloom

James Lawrence King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Javier Garcia-Bengochea

Defendant

Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aziza F Elayan-Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

2 South Biscayne Tower, Ste. 3800

Miami, FL 33131

Rodney Stuart Margol

Attorney at Margol , Margol, PA

2029 North Third Street

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

Roberto Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2351

Stephanie Anne Casey

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Zachary Andrew Lipshultz

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Daniel Ponce

Attorney at Holland & Knight

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Sanford Lewis Bohrer

Attorney at Holland & Knight

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 9/9/2020., Motions due by 9/14/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 10:15 AM before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#19

(#19) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#18

(#18) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER OF TRANSFER to Senior Judge James Lawrence King for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 09/17/2019. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Andrew Lipshultz on behalf of Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Attorney Zachary Andrew Lipshultz added to party Javier Garcia-Bengochea(pty:pla). (Lipshultz, Zachary) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Support re 8 MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Javier Garcia-Bengochea of Filing Return of Service (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sanford Lewis Bohrer on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Sanford Lewis Bohrer added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Bohrer, Sanford) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. by 10/4/2019. Re: #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, filed by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#5

(#10) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk; see 8 MOTION to Transfer. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (kpe) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. See DE #12 Notice. (kpe) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 9/9/2020., Motions due by 9/14/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 10:15 AM before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER OF TRANSFER to Senior Judge James Lawrence King for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 09/17/2019. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Andrew Lipshultz on behalf of Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Attorney Zachary Andrew Lipshultz added to party Javier Garcia-Bengochea(pty:pla). (Lipshultz, Zachary) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Support re 8 MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 13 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. See DE #12 Notice. (kpe) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Javier Garcia-Bengochea of Filing Return of Service (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk; see 8 MOTION to Transfer. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sanford Lewis Bohrer on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Sanford Lewis Bohrer added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Bohrer, Sanford) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. by 10/4/2019. Re: #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, filed by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Transfer by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. See DE #5 for image. (kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Javier Garcia-Bengochea (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (kpe) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Filing fees $ 6948.00 receipt number 113C-11936641. This amount includes the filing fee of $ 400.00 for Opening a Civil Action and $ 6,548.00 for this Action, filed by Javier Garcia-Bengochea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aziza F Elayan-Martinez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roberto Martinez