Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2020 at 08:29:10 (UTC).

Garcia Alvarez v. US Department of Homeland Security

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Garcia Alvarez filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against US Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul J. Barbadoro and Andrea K. Johnstone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00334

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul J. Barbadoro

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garcia Alvarez

Emerson Garcia Alvarez

Dover, NH 03820

Defendants and Respondents

US Department of Homeland Security

Christopher Brackett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald L. Abramson

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

180 Bridge St

Manchester, NH 03104

Respondent Attorney

Terry L. Ollila

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#11) US Marshal Service of Process re: #10 Order served on 3/20/2020, on Christopher Brackett, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent.(js) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#9

(#9) PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (ed) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#4

(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Weyland, Loren) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry L. Ollila on behalf of US Department of Homeland Security Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:res).(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS REPORT by Emerson Garcia Alvarez (Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/3/2020. Status report to be filed in 30 days. (Pltfs Atty: Ronald Abramson) (Defts Atty: Terry Ollila)(Total Hearing Time: 15 minutes)(CJA Time: 15 minutes) (js) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketRESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2020 11:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The court has provided the parties with dial-in information.(js) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Certified mail receipt for Ice Boston Field Office. (js) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) US Marshal Service of Process re: #10 Order served on 3/20/2020, on Christopher Brackett, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent.(js) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The court will contact the parties with dial-in information.(js) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Attorney Appointment- Attorney Ronald L. Abramson appointed in the case as to Emerson Garcia Alvarez.(js) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The clerk's office is directed to appoint counsel for the petitioner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B) of the Criminal Justice Act. Once appointed, counsel shall have 14 days to review the case and a status conference will be scheduled accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING- Status Conference scheduled for 3/16/2020 is CANCELLED per Standing Order 20-4 issued March 15, 2020. The court will reschedule the hearing. (js) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (ed) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (ed) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:20-cv-10474. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred to to District of New Hampshire;. Original file with documents numbered 1-6,and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Weyland, Loren) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST079157 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Emerson Garcia Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form I-797C, Notice of Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Weyland, Loren) (Weyland, Loren). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RONALD ABRAMSON