This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2021 at 08:18:40 (UTC).

Garbis Iclisoy v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Garbis Iclisoy filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05003

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garbis Iclisoy

Defendants

The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan

Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael B Horrow

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Scott E Calvert

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Theodora R Lee

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1255 Treat Boulevard Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Dominique N Thomas

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1255 Treat Blvd Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Francis J Torrence

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

525 Market Street 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.. (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #18 . The Court, for good cause appearing and pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, hereby dismisses Defendant THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN (the "Plan") from this case, without prejudice. Plaintiff and the Plan shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs directly related to this Stipulation and the dismissal of the Plan, and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company shall remain the only named defendant in this action. The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order to Dismiss Defendant Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Di

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #16 . (mrgo) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan answer now due 8/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan.(Thomas, Dominique) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

7 #1

Summons for The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy, identifying Garbis Iclisoy, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#1

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan answer now due 7/28/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan.(Attorney Dominique N Thomas added to party The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft))(Thomas, Dominique) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.. (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #18 . The Court, for good cause appearing and pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, hereby dismisses Defendant THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN (the "Plan") from this case, without prejudice. Plaintiff and the Plan shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs directly related to this Stipulation and the dismissal of the Plan, and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company shall remain the only named defendant in this action. The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan filed by Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss Defendant Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan)(Thomas, Dominique) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #16 . (mrgo) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/01/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Dominique) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan answer now due 8/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan.(Thomas, Dominique) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Francis J Torrence added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan answer now due 7/28/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan.(Attorney Dominique N Thomas added to party The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft))(Thomas, Dominique) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy, upon Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montengro, C.T. Corp Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy, upon Defendant The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aaliyah Wamsley- Agent for CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons for The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan) (ghap) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy, identifying Garbis Iclisoy, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31491266 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Garbis Iclisoy. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Garbis Iclisoy(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Calvert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Brian Horrow