This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:48:23 (UTC).

GARBER et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by GARBER against JOHNSON JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17135

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELLEN GARBER

VLADIMIR GARBER

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELLEN GARBER, VLADIMIR GARBER. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915870) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELLEN GARBER, VLADIMIR GARBER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELLEN GARBER, VLADIMIR GARBER. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 8/23/19, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. Select TRENTON when filing a short form complaint for MDL 2738 . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915870) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELLEN GARBER, VLADIMIR GARBER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.