This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 10:58:53 (UTC).

Garaygordobil v. Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Garaygordobil filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03006

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pilar Garaygordobil

Defendants

June S. Almenoff

Michael Ferguson

Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Thomas M. Riedhammer

Jason S. Slakter

Orin Hirschman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) June S. Almenoff, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/11/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

4 #5

Waiver of the Service of Summons for Thomas M. Riedhammer

4 #4

Waiver of the Service of Summons for Orin Hirschman

4 #3

Waiver of the Service of Summons for Michael Ferguson

4 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons for June S. Almenoff

4 #1

Waiver of the Service of Summons for Jason S. Slakter

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. June S. Almenoff waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Michael Ferguson waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Orin Hirschman waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Thomas M. Riedhammer waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Jason S. Slakter waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Jason S. Slakter, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons for June S. Almenoff, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Michael Ferguson, #4 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Orin Hirschman, #5 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Thomas M. Riedhammer)(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-02386. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil.(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #1

Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against June S. Almenoff, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) June S. Almenoff, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/11/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02386-PKC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. June S. Almenoff waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Michael Ferguson waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Orin Hirschman waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Thomas M. Riedhammer waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; Jason S. Slakter waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Jason S. Slakter, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons for June S. Almenoff, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Michael Ferguson, #4 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Orin Hirschman, #5 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Thomas M. Riedhammer)(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge P. Kevin Castel as possibly related to 19cv2386. (pc) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Pilar Garaygordobil. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-02386. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil.(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against June S. Almenoff, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter. Document filed by Pilar Garaygordobil. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less