This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:57:34 (UTC).

Garabed Markarian v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Garabed Markarian filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09209

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garabed Markarian

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armine Markosyan

Attorney at Law Offices of Armine Markosyan

417 Arden Avenue Suite 114-D

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Ashley Elise Oaks

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#18) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Burbank Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Garabed Markarian. Motion set for hearing on 2/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Markosyan, Armine) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Burbank Courthouse #15 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document. OTHER: Case number is incorrect or missing. Missing identifying Judge and Magistrate's initials on official case number. (nor is Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha named in the filing). The correct case number is to read as: 2:21-cv-09209-FLA (PVCx). February 18, 2022 is a closed motion date. Refer to the CLOSED MOTION calendar in advance of filing any future motions. (lc) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Burbank Courthouse #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Missing identifying Judge and Magistrate's initials on official case number. (nor is Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha named in the filing). The correct case number is to read as: 2:21-cv-9209- FLA (PVCx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#15) (STRICKEN PER 1/20/22 COURT G112B RESPONSE DOCKET NO. 17). First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Burbank Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Garabed Markarian. Motion set for hearing on 2/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Markosyan, Armine) Modified on 1/20/2022 (lc). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, ANDCONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Jury Trial set for 11/15/2022 08:30 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 10/28/2022 at 01:00 PM ; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2022 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#13) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 09/23/2022. (tf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#12) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the January 28, 2022, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 - 6 days, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#10) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On November 29, 2021, the court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by January 7, 2022. (Dkt. [9.]) The parties failed to file the Joint Report. Counsel shall file the report no later than January 14, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to January 28, 2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the court. Any future failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (pg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (pg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/23/2021, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Garabed Markarian in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/18/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21BBCV00736 Receipt No: ACACDC-32382265 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Ashley Elise Oaks added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley Elise Oaks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman