This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 09:50:03 (UTC).

Gara v. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Gara filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Director, U S Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20133

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kosta Gara

Defendants

Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou

U.S Citizenship and Immigration Services

Director Alejandro Mayorkas

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Secretary, U.S. Department Homeland Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff D. Joseph

Attorney at Joseph & Hall P.C.

12203 East Second Ave.

Aurora, CO 80011

Defendant Attorneys

Noticing INS Attorney

James Alan Weinkle

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

101 S. U.S. Highway One, Suite 3100

Fort Pierce, FL 34950

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/6/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER that plaintiff's Opposition if any to the Motion to Transfer is due by Monday, Novemenr 1, 2021; Reply is due November 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/8/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/11/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case ; case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/11/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#16

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - USCIS' March 8, 2022 RFE (Redacted), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinkle, James) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Alan Weinkle on behalf of Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Ur Mendoza Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party U.S Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Weinkle, James) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance/ Noticing INS Attorney added on behalf of Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S Citizenship and Immigration Services (jc) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jeff D. Joseph, mailing date January 11, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#15) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case transferred in from Maryland; Case Number 8:21-cv-01947. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case ; case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/11/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/11/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Haven, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Kosta Gara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Instructions for Form I-4017, #2 Affidavit of Attorney Mark Stevens, #3 Exhibit Notice of USCIS workload transfer, #4 Exhibit Notice of USCIS workload transfer, #5 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing in In Re Visa Applications)(Joseph, Jeff) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that plaintiff's Opposition if any to the Motion to Transfer is due by Monday, Novemenr 1, 2021; Reply is due November 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/8/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Transfer Case by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haven, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kosta Gara. All Defendants.(Joseph, Jeff) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on United States Attorney on 08/11/2021, filed by Kosta Gara.(Joseph, Jeff) Modified on 8/18/2021 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) QC NOTICE: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Kosta Gara was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Christina Mitchell, Civil Process Clerk / Maryland Acting U.S. Attorney on 08/11/2021, filed by Kosta Gara.(Joseph, Jeff) Modified on 8/17/2021 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/6/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 60 days as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9414232.), filed by Kosta Kasra Gara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh 1, Form I-407 Instructions, #3 Exhibit Exh 2, Green Card, #4 Exhibit Exh 3, Form I-829 Receipt, #5 Exhibit Exh 4, Marriage Record, #6 Exhibit Exh 5, Form I-130 and Form I-485 Receipts, #7 Exhibit Exh 6, Declaration of Samia Gara, #8 Exhibit Exh 7, Declaration of Lynne Feldman, #9 Exhibit Exh 8, Withdrawal Request, #10 Exhibit Exh 9, Form I-407, #11 Exhibit Exh 10, Withdrawal Acknowledgement, #12 Exhibit Exh 11, Form I-130 Approval Notice, #13 Exhibit Exh 12, Notice of Decision, #14 Summons Civil Summons Mayorkas, #15 Summons Civil Summons Civil Process Clerk, #16 Summons Civil Summons Garland, #17 Summons Civil Summons Jaddou, #18 Summons Civil Summons USCIS)(Joseph, Jeff) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Alan Weinkle