This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2020 at 09:13:38 (UTC).

GANNOM v. WINKLE et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 GANNOM filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WINKLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02362

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LONNIE E GANNOM

LONNIE E. GANNOM

Defendants

MATT MCCONNELL

COREY POSEY

CHASE HUNTER

JOSEPH CHASE WINKLE

JOSEPH KREJSA

JOSEPH JOURNAY

JOSEPH WINKLE

JEREMY GIBSON

CITY OF MUNCIE

ALBANY INDIANA TOWN OF

TOWN OF ALBANY, INDIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ray Thompson

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D. KING, JR., P.C.

22 E. Washington Street, Suite 310

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Robert D. King, Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D. KING, JR, P.C.

22 E. Washington Street, Suite 310

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle A. Jones

Attorney at NORRIS CHOPLIN & SCHROEDER LLP

101 West Ohio Street, Ninth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Tia J Combs

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP

2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

Tia J. Combs

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP

2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

R. Jeffrey Lowe

Attorney at KIGHTLINGER & GRAY, LLP (New Albany)

Bonterra Building, 3620 Blackiston Boulevard, Suite 200

New Albany, IN 47150

John Vincent Maurovich

Attorney at COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER

255 East Carmel Drive

Carmel, IN 46032

Matthew L. Hinkle

Attorney at COOTS HENKE & WHEELER

255 E. Carmel Drive

Carmel, IN 46032

Matthew L. Kelsey

Attorney at DEFUR VORAN LLP

400 S. Walnut Street, Suite 200

Muncie, IN 47305

James R. Williams

Attorney at DEFUR VORAN LLP (Munice)

400 South Walnut Street Suite 200

Muncie, IN 47305

Scott E. Shockley

Attorney at DEFUR VORAN LLP

400 South Walnut Street, Suite 200

Muncie, IN 47305

Casey C. Stansbury

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP

2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

James S. Stephenson

Attorney at STEPHENSON MOROW & SEMLER

3077 E. 98Th Street, Suite 240

Indianapolis, IN 46280

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#23

#22

#21

#20

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Record

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2021. Discovery due by 7/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/28/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on October 27, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on January 27, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Tia Combs and Casey Stansbury on behalf of CHASE HUNTER, JOSEPH JOURNAY, CITY OF MUNCIE, COREY POSEY (Combs, Tia) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Complaint , filed by JOSEPH WINKLE.(Kelsey, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff LONNIE E. GANNOM and Defendants. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JOSEPH CHASE WINKLE. (Lowe, R.) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Stay (Limited Stay of Discovery) , filed by Defendant JEREMY GIBSON. (Stephenson, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Stay (Limited Stay of Discovery), filed by Defendant JEREMY GIBSON. (Stephenson, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint , Defenses and Request for Jury Trial, filed by MATT MCCONNELL, TOWN OF ALBANY, INDIANA.(Jones, Kyle) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendant JEREMY GIBSON. (Stephenson, James) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeffrey Lowe on behalf of Defendant JOSEPH CHASE WINKLE. (Lowe, R.) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2020 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/15/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT to Removal by JOSEPH WINKLE. (Kelsey, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Williams on behalf of Defendant JOSEPH WINKLE. (Williams, James) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to Removal by ALBANY INDIANA TOWN OF, MATT MCCONNELL. (Jones, Kyle) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle A. Jones on behalf of Defendants ALBANY INDIANA TOWN OF, MATT MCCONNELL. (Jones, Kyle) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tia J Combs on behalf of Defendants JEREMY GIBSON, CHASE HUNTER, JOSEPH JOURNAY, CITY OF MUNCIE, COREY POSEY. (Combs, Tia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware Circuit Court, case number 18C05-2008-CT-000078, filed by CHASE HUNTER, JEREMY GIBSON, JOSEPH JOURNAY, CITY OF MUNCIE, COREY POSEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6174596) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Combs, Tia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ray Thompson