This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2022 at 07:37:05 (UTC).

Ganley v. Arizona Board of Regents

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 Ganley filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Arizona Board of Regents. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Camille D Bibles and Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Camille D Bibles

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen Ganley

Defendant

Arizona Board of Regents

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tod F Schleier

Attorney at Schleier Law Offices PC

4600 E Shea Blvd., Ste. 208

Phoenix, AZ 85028

Bradley Hugh Schleier

Attorney at Schleier Law Offices PC

4600 E Shea Blvd., Ste. 208

Phoenix, AZ 85028

Defendant Attorney

Betsy Jean Lamm

Attorney at Cohen Kennedy Dowd & Quigley

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20291123 filed by Kathleen Ganley. (Schleier, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Kathleen Ganley. (Schleier, Bradley) (MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Kathleen Ganley. (Schleier, Bradley) (MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20291123. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-164-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kathleen Ganley: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial and Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction for Magistrate upon Northern Arizona University on March 2, 2022. (Schleier, Bradley) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Consent Form

#10

(#10) ORDER: The stipulated motion #9 is granted. Defendant shall have until April 6, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 3/14/2022. (REK) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-00164-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#13) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: The stipulated motion #9 is granted. Defendant shall have until April 6, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 3/14/2022. (REK) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Arizona Board of Regents. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lamm, Betsy) (Entered: 03/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kathleen Ganley: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial and Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction for Magistrate upon Northern Arizona University on March 2, 2022. (Schleier, Bradley) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#7) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20291123. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-164-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Kathleen Ganley. (Schleier, Bradley) (MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Kathleen Ganley. (Schleier, Bradley) (MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20291123 filed by Kathleen Ganley. (Schleier, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arizona Board of Regents is a litigant