This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:46:13 (UTC).

Ganey v. St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Ganey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against St Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Skretny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00905

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Skretny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Ganey

Defendants

ST. ALPHONSUS ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH

SCHOOL a/k/a HOLY FAMILY CHURCH OF AUBURN NY

ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER

St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School

Holy Family Church of Auburn NY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel C. Levin

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Keith R. Vona

Attorney at Richmond Vona, LLC

1659 Amherst Street, Suite 100

Buffalo, NY 14214

Daniel Levin

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman, LLP

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3697

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Declaration Keith R. Vona, Esq.

4 #2

Exhibit Admission Petition

4 #3

Exhibit Admission Sponsor Affidavit

4 #4

Exhibit Attorney's Oath

4 #5

Exhibit Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath

4 #6

Exhibit Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration

#6

#7

#8

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Roman Catholic Diocese of Rochester Pastoral Center on 08/19/2021, filed by Richard Ganey. (Vona, Keith) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal of defendant, The Diocese of Rochester by Richard Ganey. (Vona, Keith) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School on 08/17/2021, filed by Richard Ganey. (Vona, Keith) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Daniel C. Levin's #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 8/19/2021. (JCM) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to appear pro hac vice Daniel C. Levin, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4335035.) by Richard Ganey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Keith R. Vona, Esq., #2 Exhibit Admission Petition, #3 Exhibit Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Attorney's Oath, #5 Exhibit Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #6 Exhibit Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration)(Vona, Keith) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Roman Catholic Diocese of Rochester, St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School. (TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons Filed. (Vona, Keith) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4328417, filed by Richard Ganey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vona, Keith) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Levin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL C. LEVIN