This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 07:43:11 (UTC).

Ganci et al v. MBF Inspection Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Ganci filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against MBF Inspection Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Yarbrough and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Appellants

Glynn Estess

Gary Brooks

Gary Marshall

Larry Alexander

Richard Gill

Thomas Ganci

Appellee and In Re

MBF Inspection Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Matthew C. Helland

Attorney at Nichols Kaster, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94104

Daniel S Brome

Attorney at Nicholas Kaster LLP

235 Montgomery St., Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher M. Moody

Attorney at Moody & Stanford PC

4169 Montgomery Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Appellee and In Re Attorneys

Jennie Deden Behles

Attorney at Behles Law Firm

Po Box 7070, 202 Central Se, Ste A-100 (87102)

Albuquerque, NM 87194-7070

Eric Bravo

Attorney at Lane Alton

Two Miranova Place, Suite 220

Columbus, OH 43212

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Clerk's Certificate of Service First Amended Bankruptcy Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Deden Behles on behalf of MBF Inspection Services, Inc. (Behles, Jennie) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#1

(#1) Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Gary Marshall (Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#11

(#11) Clerk's Certificate of Service Bankruptcy Clerk's Status Regarding Transmission of Record on Appeal by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANTS TO CURE DEFECTS by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kc) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by MBF Inspection Services, Inc. Notice And Certificate Persuant To D.N.M. L RCiv 83.3 (a) (1) (Behles, Jennie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Good Standing (Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough quashing #10 Order Directing Appellants to Cure Defects. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Clerk's Certificate of Service Bankruptcy Clerk's Status Regarding Transmission of Record on Appeal by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANTS TO CURE DEFECTS by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kc) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by MBF Inspection Services, Inc. Notice And Certificate Persuant To D.N.M. L RCiv 83.3 (a) (1) (Behles, Jennie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6291259 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by MBF Inspection Services, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bravo, Eric) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#8) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Appellee MBF Inspection Services, Inc. by Eric Bravo (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bravo, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Deden Behles on behalf of MBF Inspection Services, Inc. (Behles, Jennie) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Good Standing (Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6245070 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gary Marshall, Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Glynn Estess (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6245036 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gary Marshall, Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Glynn Estess (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • (#5) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Appellants Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of: Daniel S. Brome NICHOLS KASTER, LLP 235 Montgomery St., Suite 810San Francisco, CA 94104 415-277-7235 dbrome@nka.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moody, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • (#4) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Appellants Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of: Matthew C. Helland NICHOLS KASTER, LLP 235 Montgomery St., Suite 810San Francisco, CA 94104 415-277-7235 helland@nka.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moody, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Clerk's Certificate of Service First Amended Bankruptcy Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Gary Marshall (Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.