This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:17:32 (UTC).

Gamino v. American Car Center, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Gamino filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against American Car Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Parker, Annie T. Christoff and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02347

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

Presiding Judges

Thomas L. Parker

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Gamino

Defendants

American Car Center, LLC

American Financial, Inc.

RAC Dealership, LLC

RAC Servicer, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary B. Busey

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Dean J. Shauger

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, P.C.

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr added and Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case pursuant to DE #12 . (agj) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/2/22. (aah) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Dean J. Shauger on behalf of RAC Servicer, LLC (Shauger, Dean) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of RAC Servicer, LLC (Busey, Zachary) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Crystal Gamino of Consent to Join of Marteshia Moore (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Crystal Gamino of Consent to Join of Corey Darrell Jones (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

7 #3

summons

7 #2

summons

7 #1

summons

7 #7

Main Document

#3

(#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

1 #7

Summons to be Issued

1 #5

Summons to be Issued

1 #4

Summons to be Issued

1 #3

Exhibit B- Employee Handbook

1 #2

Exhibit A- Gamino Consent to Join

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr added and Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case pursuant to DE #12 . (agj) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/2/22. (aah) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Dean J. Shauger on behalf of RAC Servicer, LLC (Shauger, Dean) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of RAC Servicer, LLC (Busey, Zachary) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Crystal Gamino of Consent to Join of Marteshia Moore (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Crystal Gamino of Consent to Join of Corey Darrell Jones (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to American Car Center, LLC, American Financial, Inc., RAC Dealership, LLC, RAC Servicer, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Car Center, LLC, American Financial, Inc., RAC Dealership, LLC, RAC Servicer, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3891145), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Gamino Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit B- Employee Handbook, #4 Summons to be Issued, #5 Summons to be Issued, #6 Summons to be Issued, #7 Summons to be Issued)(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CAR CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FINANCIAL GROUP COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN J SHAUGER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary B. Busey