This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:00:40 (UTC).

GAMBOA v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GAMBOA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman, James Patrick Hanlon, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04819

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Matthew P. Brookman

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

James Patrick Hanlon

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUADALUPE GAMBOA

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL, LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

COOK MEDICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leslie MacLean

Attorney at WATERS & KRAUS, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Zainab Tarique

Attorney at WATERS & KRAUS, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie MacLean on behalf of Plaintiff GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (MacLean, Leslie) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Zainab Tarique on behalf of Plaintiff GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (Tarique, Zainab) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04617-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04730-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5755838) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tarique, Zainab) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 #12607

(#10) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint, filed by Plaintiff GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB(Tarique, Zainab) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04617-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04730-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James Patrick Hanlon, Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#6) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/12/2019.(LBT) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint, filed by Plaintiff GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB(Tarique, Zainab) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04617-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04730-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04617-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04730-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#7) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:19-cv-04818-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04838-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 12/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04818-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04838-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/12/2019.(LBT) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James Patrick Hanlon, Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie MacLean on behalf of Plaintiff GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (MacLean, Leslie) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Zainab Tarique on behalf of Plaintiff GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (Tarique, Zainab) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GUADALUPE GAMBOA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5755838) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tarique, Zainab) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less