This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:18:00 (UTC).

Gamble v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Gamble filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01558

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee Anthony Gamble

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard D. Olinsky

Attorney at Olinsky Law Group

250 South Clinton Street, Ste 210

Syracuse, NY 13202

Defendant Attorney

Ronald W. Makawa

Attorney at Social Security Administration

J.F.K. Federal Building, Room 625, 15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Lee Anthony Gamble advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: The Court has considered Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in this matter under 28 USC 1915. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/19/2019. (mab) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Makawa appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 3/18/2020. (Makawa, Ronald) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 1/8/2020. (khr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lee Anthony Gamble. (khr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (khr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.