This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:52:16 (UTC).

Gambardella v. Metro-North Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Gambardella filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Metro-North Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01622

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent T. Gambardella

Defendant

Metro-North Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen J. Fitzgerald

Attorney at Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC

405 Orange St.

New Haven, CT 06511

Charles C. Goetsch

Attorney at Charles Goetsch Law Offices LLC

405 Orange Street

New Haven, CT 06511

Defendant Attorney

Beck S. Fineman

Attorney at Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP

1000 Lafayette Boulevard, Suite 800

Bridgeport, CT 06604

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Metro-North Railroad Company waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/15/2019 filed by Vincent T. Gambardella. (Goetsch, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Vincent T. Gambardella, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Vincent T. Gambardella. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2019, Discovery due by 4/16/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Vincent T. Gambardella (Fitzgerald, Stephen) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5486011.), filed by Vincent T. Gambardella.(Goetsch, Charles) Modified on 10/16/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Metro-North Railroad Company waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/15/2019 filed by Vincent T. Gambardella. (Goetsch, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Vincent T. Gambardella, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Vincent T. Gambardella. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2019, Discovery due by 4/16/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Vincent T. Gambardella (Fitzgerald, Stephen) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5486011.), filed by Vincent T. Gambardella.(Goetsch, Charles) Modified on 10/16/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.