This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2021 at 08:49:44 (UTC).

Gamal Solomon v. Alex Villenueva

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Gamal Solomon filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Alex Villenueva. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips, Alexander F. MacKinnon, Josephine L. Staton and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07722

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia A. Phillips

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judges

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gamal Soloman

Woodland Hills, CA 91365

Defendants

Alex Villenueva

Donald Steele

Jeff Prang

Joyce Caplan

Lenny Ross

Julie Mistros

Chris Mistros

Richard Ivester

Amy Ivester

Ivester and Associates, Inc.

Ashley Manara Soloman

Lilah Noelle Soloman

Washington Mutual

Chase Bank

Jan Caplan

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

CV71

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. See Order for details. (cch) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the case assignment is a Civil Rights (1983) vice Discovery assignment. this case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07722 CJC(JPR). (rn) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-07722-JLS(JPR). (dta) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-07722-JLS(JPR). (dta) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the case assignment is a Civil Rights (1983) vice Discovery assignment. this case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07722 CJC(JPR). (rn) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. See Order for details. (cch) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to All Defendants. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gamal Soloman. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Gamal Soloman against Defendants Jan Caplan, Joyce Caplan, Chase Bank, Amy Ivester, Richard Ivester, Ivester and Associates, Inc., Chris Mistros, Julie Mistros, Jeff Prang, Lenny Ross, Ashley Manara Soloman, Lilah Noelle Soloman, Donald Steele, Alex Villenueva, Washington Mutual. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Filing fee $ 402 Paid.) Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant