This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:18:45 (UTC).

Galvin v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Galvin filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cathy Galvin

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen Overton

Attorney at Parmele Law Firm

1505 E. Bradford Parkway

Springfield, MO 65804

Defendant Attorney

OGCSSAR7

Attorney at Office of General Counsel-SSA Region 7

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 7/28/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 8/3/2020 Social security answer due by 10/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 11/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: US Atty 8/3/20; Office of Regional Counsel 8/3/20; Atty General 8/6/20)(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONSES ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses returned via email to counsel for service. (Burch, Steve) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Cathy Galvin. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Cathy Galvin. Service due by 10/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 7/28/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Cathy Galvin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Cathy Galvin(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less