This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2021 at 10:25:03 (UTC).

Luis Polo Galvez v. Western Refining Retail, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Luis Polo Galvez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Western Refining Retail, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11443

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Polo Galvez

Defendants

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Western Refining, Inc.

Western Refining Retail, LLC

Western Refining Southwest, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samantha Ortiz

Ramin R Younessi

Defendant Attorneys

Matt Light

William C. Martucci

Kristen A. Page

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#20

#18

#17

#16

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Declaration of Abbie Woodward in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez's Complaint #19 filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Light, Matt) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez. Adding Samantha L. Ortiz as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez. (Younessi, Ramin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez's Complaint #19 filed by Plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Samantha L. Ortiz)(Younessi, Ramin) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez's Complaint filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Light, Matt) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-05768-VAP-SKx. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-11443-VAP-SKx. Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (aco) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney William C. Martucci APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Western Refining Retail, LLC and Western Refining Southwest, Inc., designating Matt Light as local counsel. (shb) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING, #10 , #12 Non-Resident Attorney Kristen A. Page APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Western Refining Retain, LLC and Western Refining Southwest Inc., designating Matt Light as local counsel. (shb) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William C. Martucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29700798) filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Light, Matt) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kristen A Page on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William C Martucci on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Luis Polo Galvez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 served on December 18, 2020. (Light, Matt) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05768-VAP-SK; 5:19-cv-00855-VAP-SK; 2:19-cv-04300-VAP-SK; 2:20-cv-08342-VAP-SK (Light, Matt) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc., identifying Luis Polo Galvez; Western Refining Retail, LLC; Western Refining Southwest, Inc.; Giant Industries, Inc.; Western Refining, Inc.; Andeavor LLC; Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Light, Matt) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Western Refining Retail, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Light, Matt) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV40301 Receipt No: ACACDC-29601564 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Abbie Woodward in Support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Matt Light added to party Western Refining Retail, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matt Light added to party Western Refining Southwest, Inc. (pty:dft))(Light, Matt) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less