This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2021 at 06:27:44 (UTC).

GALVAN v. WALMART INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 GALVAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Cox Arleo and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-18000

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTA GALVAN

Defendants

WALMART INC.

GHI CORP. 1-10

JKL 1-10

JOHN DOE 1-10

ABC CORP 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RONALD J. RICCI

Attorney at RICCI & FAVA L.L.C.

16 Furler Street, 2Nd Floor

Totowa, NJ 07512

Defendant Attorney

KOHAR M. BOYADJIAN

Attorney at COTTRELL SOLENSKY, PA

3 University Plaza Drive, Suite 500

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A to Petition for Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B to Petition for Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #7 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 3/24/2021. (bt, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION as to Damages and Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice by WALMART INC.. (BOYADJIAN, KOHAR) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 3/1/2021. (jqb, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the March 1, 2021 telephone conference, Plaintiff will stipulate that the total value of this case does not meet or exceed $75,000 exclusive of costs and interest. Accordingly, and by agreement of the parties, on or before March 15, 2021, the parties will file a stipulation and proposed order of remand. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/1/2021. (Hammer, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART INC..(BOYADJIAN, KOHAR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2021 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 2/25/2021. Dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/29/2020. (jqb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Walmart Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WALMART INC..(BOYADJIAN, KOHAR) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC. identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BOYADJIAN, KOHAR) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC. from HUDSON COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number HUD-L-4229-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11758934), filed by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Petition for Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BOYADJIAN, KOHAR) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GHI CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RONALD J. RICCI