This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2022 at 08:08:57 (UTC).

Galvan v. ConocoPhillips Company

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Galvan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ConocoPhillips Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ademar Galvan

Defendant

ConocoPhillips Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorney

Shauna Johnson Clark

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright LLP

1301 Mckinney, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY, filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ConocoPhillips Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to ConocoPhillips Company served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/5/2022, filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ademar Galvan, filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re: Defendant ConocoPhillips Company's Responsive Pleading Deadline for Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Clark, Shauna) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Clark, Shauna) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Clark, Shauna) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Clark, Shauna) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Clark, Shauna) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re: Defendant ConocoPhillips Company's Responsive Pleading Deadline for Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Clark, Shauna) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ademar Galvan, filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to ConocoPhillips Company served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/5/2022, filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ConocoPhillips Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY, filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28760295) filed by ADEMAR GALVAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shauna Johnson Clark