This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:02:11 (UTC).

Galloway v. Saul

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Galloway filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Lloyd Galloway

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Upton Reynolds, II

Attorney at THOMAS UPTON REYNOLDS, II, ATTORNEY

P. O. Box 280

Charleston, MS 38921-0220

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of William Lloyd Galloway William Barr served on 12/2/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of William Lloyd Galloway Social Security Administration Commissioner c/o General Counsel served on 11/27/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of William Lloyd Galloway William Lamar served on 11/25/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300025122, filed by William Lloyd Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.