This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 12:07:28 (UTC).

GALLO v. TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 GALLO filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00664

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMERON M. GALLO

Defendants

TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY

TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC.

TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.

Attorney at HASSLER KONDRAS MILLER LLP

100 Cherry Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Defendant Attorney

Emily L. Connor

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC..(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 2/19/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/6/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendant TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by CAMERON M. GALLO. TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. served on 12/18/2020. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY. (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#3

(#3) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff CAMERON M. GALLO. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY, filed by CAMERON M. GALLO. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6321521) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC..(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 2/19/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/6/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendant TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by CAMERON M. GALLO. TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. served on 12/18/2020. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY. (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff CAMERON M. GALLO. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TIMBERLAND HOME CENTER, INC. a/k/a TIMBERLAND LUMBER COMPANY, filed by CAMERON M. GALLO. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6321521) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily L. Connor