This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:02:18 (UTC).

Gallegos v. Penzone

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Gallegos filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Penzone. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine (PS) and Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02159

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah M Fine (PS)

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Marie Gallegos

Phoenix, AZ 85009

Defendants

Paul Penzone

Mark Kiltredge

Unknown Party

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Penzone, Unknown Party, Mark Kiltredge filed by Amanda Marie Gallegos (7 pages).(DXD) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Application Form) (DXD) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Amanda Marie Gallegos (7 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#3

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Amanda Marie Gallegos. Reason for return: No longer in Custody. Document number #9 , #10 . (MSA) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Second Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $46.86. The Amended Complaint (Doc. #8 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim with 30 days leave to file a second amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (DXD) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Amanda Marie Gallegos. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (DXD) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

5 #1

Application Form

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Amanda Marie Gallegos. Reason for return: No longer in Custody. Document number #9 , #10 . (MSA) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Amanda Marie Gallegos. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (DXD) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Second Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $46.86. The Amended Complaint (Doc. #8 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim with 30 days leave to file a second amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (DXD) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Penzone, Unknown Party, Mark Kiltredge filed by Amanda Marie Gallegos (7 pages).(DXD) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Application Form) (DXD) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Amanda Marie Gallegos (2 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Amanda Marie Gallegos (7 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.