This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 15:39:44 (UTC).

Gallegos v. Aponte et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Gallegos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Aponte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederic Block and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02934

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricardo Gallegos

Defendants

Ready Refresh By Nestle

Nestle Waters North America, Inc.

ATS Master Trust

Carlos Aponte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Elefterakis

Attorney at Elefterakis Elefterakis & Panek P.C.

80 Pine Street, 38Th Flr.

New York, NY 10005

Brian James Vannella

Attorney at Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorney

Raymond Law

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

1133 Westchester Avenue

White Plains, NY 10604

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Vannella on behalf of Ricardo Gallegos (aty to be noticed) (Vannella, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order by ATS Master Trust, Carlos Aponte, Nestle Waters North America, Inc., Ready Refresh By Nestle (Law, Raymond) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 6/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 6/10/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/26/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Carlos Aponte, Ready Refresh By Nestle, Nestle Waters North America, Inc. and ATS Master Trust from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Queens County, case number 718849/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14504388) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Law, Raymond) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketORDER. As discussed on the 6/15/2021 record, the schedule is as follows. Initial disclosures by 7/1/2021; discovery requests served by 7/15/2021; pleading amendments by by 7/15/2021; fact discovery by 10/15/2021; initial expert disclosures by 10/15/2021; opening expert reports by 11/15/2021; and rebuttal expert reports by 1/14/2021. All discovery due by 2/15/2022, and the parties must file a letter certifying its close by that same date. Any party wishing to commence dispositive motion practice must do so by 3/15/2022 in accordance with the District Judge's Individual Rules, and the parties must file their Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by 4/15/2022. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 12/7/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 11/30/2021, the parties must file a joint status report. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. If either party requests trial by jury, they should file their demand expeditiously. As discussed on the record, the parties will confer regarding referral for mediation and file a joint letter requesting the same if they reach such agreement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/15/2021. (Lozar, Ryan) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2021. Brian Vanella for Plaintiff. Raymond Law for Defendants. (FTR Log #10:37-10:56.) (Scully, Nicole) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Vannella on behalf of Ricardo Gallegos (aty to be noticed) (Vannella, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order by ATS Master Trust, Carlos Aponte, Nestle Waters North America, Inc., Ready Refresh By Nestle (Law, Raymond) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 6/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 6/10/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/26/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Carlos Aponte, Ready Refresh By Nestle, Nestle Waters North America, Inc. and ATS Master Trust from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Queens County, case number 718849/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14504388) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Law, Raymond) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nestle Waters North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Elefterakis