This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2019 at 08:43:42 (UTC).

Gallardo v. The Kroger Co

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Gallardo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02292

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosa Gallardo

Defendant

The Kroger Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina Davis

Attorney at Davis Law Office PC

5606 Fm 423, Suite 500-327

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant Attorneys

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Sara Kimbrough Scudday

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/8/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Kroger Co. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Kroger Co. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibits

1 #1

Index of Attachments

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-09995 filed by The Kroger Co. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10294925) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Attachments, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • Case copied to 4:19-cv-946-A. Transfer to Fort Worth Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ctf) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Nov 8 16:31:16 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/8/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Kroger Co. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. 3 Thu Sep 26 14:22:22 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Kroger Co. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-09995 filed by The Kroger Co. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10294925) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Attachments, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant