This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:56:41 (UTC).

Gallagher v. Drug Enforcement Administration et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Gallagher filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Drug Enforcement Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan Sasha Gallagher

Castle Rock, CO 80109

Ryan Sasha-Shai Van Kush

Castle Rock, CO 80109

Defendants

Dan McCormick

Drug Enforcement Administration

Loren T. Miller

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-10988. File, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT by Clerk re:6 Order of Dismissal. (apesa, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ryan Sasha Gallagher. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to comply with the sanction order restricting his ability to file pro se actions in the District of Colorado. Mr. Gallagher is denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/9/2020. (apesa, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/13/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration, Daniel McCormick, Loren T. Miller. Document filed by Ryan Sasha Gallagher. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) JUDGMENT by Clerk re:6 Order of Dismissal. (apesa, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to comply with the sanction order restricting his ability to file pro se actions in the District of Colorado. Mr. Gallagher is denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/9/2020. (apesa, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-10988. File, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Ryan Sasha Gallagher 1723 Candleglow St. Castle Rock, CO 80109. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Colorado (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/13/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration, Daniel McCormick, Loren T. Miller. Document filed by Ryan Sasha Gallagher. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ryan Sasha Gallagher. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.