This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:55:43 (UTC).

Maynor Galindo v. Phillips 66 Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Maynor Galindo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Phillips 66 Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pedro V. Castillo and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07522

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maynor Galindo

Defendants

Phillips 66 Company

Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC

Phillips 66 Spectrum Corporation

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Beverly Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suie 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas D Poper

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Michael S Chamberlin

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Vartan Serge Madoyan

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Vivian Yuxi Shen

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#18

(#18) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES, Phillips 66 Company, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips 66 Spectrum Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo(Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff leave to file the amended complaint attached to the parties' joint stipulation as Exhibit A. Defendants are ordered to answer or otherwise respond via a motion to dismiss, stay and/or transfer by not later than November 10, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES, Phillips 66 Company, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips 66 Spectrum Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo(Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff leave to file the amended complaint attached to the parties' joint stipulation as Exhibit A. Defendants are ordered to answer or otherwise respond via a motion to dismiss, stay and/or transfer by not later than November 10, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) [Minute Order] SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court held a Scheduling Conference in this case on October 22, 2021. The Court noted that the complaint in this case, Dkt. o. 1-1, is largely identical to the First Amended Complaint (FAC) in another case before Chief Judge Seeborg in the Northern District of California, Robbins v. Phillips Co., Case No. 3:18-cv-00292-RS (N.D. Cal.), Dkt. No. 102-1. There are seven causes of action in the Robbins FAC and six causes of action in the Galindo complaint. The two complaints also seek the exact same thirteen forms of relief. The Court hereby orders the following: Plaintiff is ordered to file a redline comparison between his complaint in this case and the Robbins FAC not later than 2 p.m. today; The parties are ordered to meet and confer today about the possibilityof Plaintiff amending his complaint; Should the parties agree on amendment, any amended complaint must be filed not later than Monday, October 25th. See attached minute order for details. (lom) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Shaun Setareh Submitting Redlined Version of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo, identifying Maynor Galindo. (Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 court days, filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maynor Galindo answer now due 10/27/2021, filed by Defendants Phillips 66 Spectrum Corporation; Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC; Phillips 66 Company.(Attorney Nicholas D Poper added to party Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas D Poper added to party Phillips 66 Spectrum Corporation(pty:dft))(Poper, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Phillips 66 Company, served on September 20, 2021 and September 24, 2021. (Poper, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (MSC) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. File the Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Report) no later than ten daysbefore the scheduling conference. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Maynor Galindo in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/17/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Phillips 66 Company, (Poper, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Phillips 66 Company. (Poper, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant Phillips 66 Company. (Poper, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV30310 Receipt No: ACACDC-32013169 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Phillips 66 Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Attorney Nicholas D Poper added to party Phillips 66 Company(pty:dft))(Poper, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phillip 66 Pipeline LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIP 66 COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vivian Y. Shen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vartan Serge Madoyan