This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 07:24:01 (UTC).

GALETTE v. AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 GALETTE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is BERLE M. SCHILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02778

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BERLE M. SCHILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUSAN GALETTE

Defendants

AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC

NEWREZ, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW S. ABRAMSON

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID E. RENNER

SIDNEY R. STEINBERG

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC, NEWREZ, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/19/22 (JL) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN GALETTE re: Junelle Mitchell served Summons and Complaint upon AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC by service of corporation - person in charge. AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN GALETTE re: Junelle Mitchell served Summons and Complaint upon NEWREZ, LLC by service of corporation - person in charge. NEWREZ, LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of NEWREZ, LLC with certificate of service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC with certificate of service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION extending Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint by AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC. (STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION extending Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint by NEWREZ, LLC. (STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 9/6/22, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/17/22. 8/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. RENNER on behalf of AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC, NEWREZ, LLC with Certificate of Service(RENNER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/04/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY HAVE UNTIL 9/20/22 TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 9/6/22. 9/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY HAVE UNTIL 9/20/22 TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 9/6/22. 9/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. RENNER on behalf of AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC, NEWREZ, LLC with Certificate of Service(RENNER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 9/6/22, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/17/22. 8/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION extending Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint by NEWREZ, LLC. (STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION extending Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint by AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC. (STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC with certificate of service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of NEWREZ, LLC with certificate of service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN GALETTE re: Junelle Mitchell served Summons and Complaint upon NEWREZ, LLC by service of corporation - person in charge. NEWREZ, LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN GALETTE re: Junelle Mitchell served Summons and Complaint upon AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC by service of corporation - person in charge. AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to AVENUE 365 LENDING SERVICES LLC, NEWREZ, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/19/22 (JL) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16049402.), filed by SUSAN GALETTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less