This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2022 at 08:02:16 (UTC).

GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC. et al v. BECERRA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against BECERRA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03085

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC. doing business as ALASKA REGIONAL HOSPITAL

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P. doing business as RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P. doing business as REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL doing business as WEST HILLS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER

LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as LOS ROBLES HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER

HCA-HEALTHONE LLC doing business as PRESBYTERIAN/ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER

HCA-HEALTHONE LLC doing business as ROSE MEDICAL CENTER

HCA-HEALTHONE LLC doing business as SWEDISH MEDICAL CENTER

HCA-HEALTHONE LLC doing business as NORTH SUBURBAN MEDICAL CENTER

HCA-HEALTHONE LLC doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF AURORA

HCA-HEALTHONE LLC doing business as SKY RIDGE MEDICAL CENTER

CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HCA FLORIDA CITRUS HOSPITAL

SEBRING HEALTH SERVICES, LLC doing business as HCA FLORIDA HIGHLANDS HOSPITAL

OKALOOSA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HCA FLORIDA TWIN CITIES HOSPITAL

JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as HCA FLORIDA JFK HOSPITAL

OSCEOLA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HCA FLORIDA OSCEOLA HOSPITAL

WEST FLORIDA - PPH, LLC doing business as HCA FLORIDA PASADENA HOSPITAL

MIAMI BEACH HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as HCA FLORIDA AVENTURA HOSPITAL

Defendant

XAVIER BECERRA

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly Anne Carroll

Attorney at HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN, PC

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

Katrina A. Pagonis

Attorney at HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN, PC

101 Montgomery St., 11Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services

1 #5

Summons Attorney General of the United States

1 #6

Summons United States Attorney for the District of Columbia

1 #7

Summons General Counsel, United States Department of Health and Human Services

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 22-cv-02904. (Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., HCA-HEALTHONE LLC, LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., WEST HILLS HOSPITAL (Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Carroll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carroll, Kelly) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 19, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint,, filed by MIAMI BEACH HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., HCA-HEALTHONE LLC, LARGO MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL, L.P., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, OSCEOLA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA - MHT, LLC, SEBRING HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, BAY HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC., UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD., SUN CITY HOSPITAL, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., FAWCETT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., OKALOOSA HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA - PPH, LLC, NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., GALENCARE, INC., KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC., NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TALLAHASSEE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., GALENCARE, INC., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., OKALOOSA HOSPITAL, INC., JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC., ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., WEST FLORIDA - MHT, LLC, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL, L.P., KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., OSCEOLA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD., LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC., SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA - PPH, LLC, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TALLAHASSEE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LARGO MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., SEBRING HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., SUN CITY HOSPITAL, INC., WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HCA-HEALTHONE LLC, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, MIAMI BEACH HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., FAWCETT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC..(Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (zed) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (zed) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint,, filed by MIAMI BEACH HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., HCA-HEALTHONE LLC, LARGO MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL, L.P., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, OSCEOLA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA - MHT, LLC, SEBRING HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, BAY HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC., UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD., SUN CITY HOSPITAL, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., FAWCETT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., OKALOOSA HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA - PPH, LLC, NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., GALENCARE, INC., KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC., NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TALLAHASSEE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., GALENCARE, INC., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., OKALOOSA HOSPITAL, INC., JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC., ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., WEST FLORIDA - MHT, LLC, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL, L.P., KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., OSCEOLA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD., LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC., SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., WEST FLORIDA - PPH, LLC, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TALLAHASSEE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LARGO MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., SEBRING HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., SUN CITY HOSPITAL, INC., WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HCA-HEALTHONE LLC, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, MIAMI BEACH HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., FAWCETT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC..(Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 19, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Carroll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carroll, Kelly) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., HCA-HEALTHONE LLC, LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., WEST HILLS HOSPITAL (Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 22-cv-02904. (Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9590647) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons Attorney General of the United States, #6 Summons United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #7 Summons General Counsel, United States Department of Health and Human Services)(Pagonis, Katrina) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less