This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2023 at 22:10:21 (UTC).

Frank Galeas v. Syncreon Technology USA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Frank Galeas filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Syncreon Technology USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-08629

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Galeas

Defendants

Syncreon Technology USA LLC

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Thomas Mara

Jill Marie Vecchi

Defendant Attorneys

Sevada Hakopian

Eric J Gitig

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTES OF SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT-IN-CONTROVERSY CALCULATION held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re order to show cause. For reasons stated on the record, the order to show cause is discharged. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. The Court sets a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for class certification for June 5, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties may stipulate to the briefing schedule, except for the reply, which is due by May 15, 2023. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

14 #1

Supplement SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AL ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCR

#14

(#14) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology USA LLC DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT-IN-CONTROVERSY CALCULATION (Attachments: #1 Supplement SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AL ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

13 #1

Proof of Service

#13

(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Frank Galeasto Order to Show Cause, #11 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

12 #1

Proof of Service

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Frank Galeas.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#11

(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT-IN-CONTROVERSY CALCULATION by Judge George H. Wu. This action is presently set for a Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2023. By January 6, 2023, defendant Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC ("Defendant") shall submit a filing addressing the following questions bearing upon its calculation of the requisite amount-in-controversy under the Class Action Fairness Act ("CAFA"): (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for January 12, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than January 5, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, 1446, and 1453 (CAFA) AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on NOVEMBER 28, 2022. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#4

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, 1446, and 1453 (CAFA) AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on NOVEMBER 28, 2022. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#3

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, 1446, and 1453 (CAFA) AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on NOVEMBER 28, 2022. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#2

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, 1446, and 1453 (CAFA) AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on NOVEMBER 28, 2022. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

1 #2

Declaration DECLARATION OF ERIC J. GITIG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNO

1 #1

Declaration DECLARATION OF AL ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLO

#1

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology USA LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/04/2023

Docket(#18) ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu. Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice in its entirety. Each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

Docket(#17) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) Frank Galeas. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MINUTES OF SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT-IN-CONTROVERSY CALCULATION held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re order to show cause. For reasons stated on the record, the order to show cause is discharged. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. The Court sets a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for class certification for June 5, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties may stipulate to the briefing schedule, except for the reply, which is due by May 15, 2023. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023

Docket(#15) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 01/12/2023 scheduling conference and order to show cause at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology USA LLC DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT-IN-CONTROVERSY CALCULATION (Attachments: #1 Supplement SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AL ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Frank Galeasto Order to Show Cause, #11 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Frank Galeas.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT-IN-CONTROVERSY CALCULATION by Judge George H. Wu. This action is presently set for a Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2023. By January 6, 2023, defendant Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC ("Defendant") shall submit a filing addressing the following questions bearing upon its calculation of the requisite amount-in-controversy under the Class Action Fairness Act ("CAFA"): (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for January 12, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than January 5, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology USA LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Frank Galeas, upon Defendant Syncreon Technology USA LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Eric J. Gitig, Counsel. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Syncreon Technology USA LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Frank Galeas. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/26/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, 1446, and 1453 (CAFA) AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on NOVEMBER 28, 2022. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC, identifying syncreon Acquisition Corp.. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV31292 Receipt No: ACACDC-34383960 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF AL ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ERIC J. GITIG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLCS NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Attorney Eric J Gitig added to party Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC(pty:dft))(Gitig, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less