This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2023 at 10:22:59 (UTC).

Galbut v. JP Morgan Chase Bank , N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 Galbut filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Bank , N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisette M. Reid and Kathleen M. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-23592

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Galbut

Defendants

JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Equifax Information Services, LLC,

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel David Lucoff

Suite 415, 3440 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Brian C Frontino

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

200 S. Biscayne Blvd., 31St Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Monique Nicole Eloi

Attorney at Jones Day

600 Brickell Ave

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #6

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (rbe) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions in this matter are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#6

(#6) STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Galbut. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/10/2022, response/answer due 12/1/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Galbut. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 11/10/2022, response/answer due 12/1/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement Joint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Monique Nicole Eloi added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Eloi, Monique) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement Joint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Monique Nicole Eloi added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Eloi, Monique) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Galbut. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 11/10/2022, response/answer due 12/1/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Galbut. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/10/2022, response/answer due 12/1/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions in this matter are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (rbe) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16075814, filed by David Galbut. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less