This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 07:59:16 (UTC).

Gaither v. Bobbitt

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Gaither filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bobbitt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Gaither

Wrightsville, GA 31096

Defendants

Bobbitt

Mr Bobbitt

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Russell Gaither. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(wwp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#9

(#9) CONSENT by Prisoner Russell Gaither to collection of fees. (wwp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Russell Gaither re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/27/19. (jrb) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Gaither. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(JH) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF TRANSFERAL OF ACTION. (jrb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. (jrb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04526. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING action re #1 Complaint filed by Russell Gaither to USDC, SDGA, Stateboro Division. Georgia State Prison is located in Reidsville, Tattnall County, within the Southern District of Georgia, the Statesboro Division. Venue is improper in this district, and the Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/31/2019. (bdb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit -Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Russell Gaither. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Russell Gaither. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(wwp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Russell Gaither. (Attachments: #1 env)(wwp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT by Prisoner Russell Gaither to collection of fees. (wwp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Russell Gaither re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/27/19. (jrb) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Gaither. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(JH) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/25/2019. (jrb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF TRANSFERAL OF ACTION. (jrb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. (jrb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04526. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Georgia, Statesboro Division. (bdb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (bdb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING action re #1 Complaint filed by Russell Gaither to USDC, SDGA, Stateboro Division. Georgia State Prison is located in Reidsville, Tattnall County, within the Southern District of Georgia, the Statesboro Division. Venue is improper in this district, and the Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/31/2019. (bdb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 Complaint for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Russell Gaither. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less