This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:21:43 (UTC).

Gaines et al v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Gaines filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03264

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jameal Gaines

Colorado Springs, CO 80920

Fachone Gaines

Colorado Springs, CO 80920

Defendant

Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Ashley Austin

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 5000

Denver, CO 80202

Karin Lisa Oko

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP-Jacksonville

50 North Laura Street, #3900

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Austin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Oko, Karin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, filed by Fachone Gaines, Jameal Gaines.(rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/21/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 1/14/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/20/2019. (ksena) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #2

Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation from El Paso County Small Claims Court, Case Number 2019S864. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7001908), filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Docket Sheet)(Austin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiffs Fachone Gaines, Jameal Gaines (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Oko, Karin) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • (#14) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/24/19. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiffs Fachone Gaines, Jameal Gaines (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER re: #11 Notice of Settlement. The Scheduling Conference set for January 21, 2020 is vacated. The parties shall file appropriate dismissal documents no later than January 13, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/12/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Oko, Karin) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond, to #4 Complaint no later than December 13, 2019. No further extensions of the deadline will be granted. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/03/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Oko, Karin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond, to #4 Complaint no later than December 4, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/22/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Austin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/21/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 1/14/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/20/2019. (ksena) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, filed by Fachone Gaines, Jameal Gaines.(rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation from El Paso County Small Claims Court, Case Number 2019S864. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7001908), filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Docket Sheet)(Austin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.