This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 09:22:37 (UTC).

Gaines et al v. BDO USA, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Gaines filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BDO USA, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01878

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patrick Gaines

Jessica Kelly

Anthony Tse

Defendants

BDO USA, LLP

The Board of Directors of BDO USA, LLP

The Retirement Plan Committee

John Does 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald Roberts Reavey

Attorney at Capozzi Adler, P.c.

2933 North Front Street

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Mark K Gyandoh

2933 North Front Street

Eric Lechtzin Lechtzin

Attorney at Edelson Lechtzin LLP

3 Terry Drive, Suite 205

Newtown, PA 18940

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Valerie Hawkins, Patrick Gaines, Anthony Tse, Jessica Kelly; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19333596.(Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Gaines, Jessica Kelly, Anthony Tse by Mark K Gyandoh (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Gaines, Jessica Kelly, Anthony Tse by Donald Roberts Reavey (Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 6/3/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 6/10/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 05/21/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Gaines, Anthony Tse, Jessica Kelly as to BDO USA, LLP on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; The Board of Directors of BDO USA, LLP on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; The Retirement Plan Committee on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#7

(#7) STATUS Report PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Patrick Gaines, Jessica Kelly, Anthony Tse (Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on plaintiffs' status report and the dates of service upon the defendants, the telephonic status hearing set for 6/10/2022 is vacated and reset to 7/19/2022 at 8:55 a.m., using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A joint status report containing a jointly-proposed discovery and pretrial schedule is to be filed on 7/12/2022. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been served with process. (mk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on plaintiffs' status report and the dates of service upon the defendants, the telephonic status hearing set for 6/10/2022 is vacated and reset to 7/19/2022 at 8:55 a.m., using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A joint status report containing a jointly-proposed discovery and pretrial schedule is to be filed on 7/12/2022. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been served with process. (mk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Patrick Gaines, Jessica Kelly, Anthony Tse (Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Gaines, Anthony Tse, Jessica Kelly as to BDO USA, LLP on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; The Board of Directors of BDO USA, LLP on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; The Retirement Plan Committee on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BDO USA, LLP, The Board of Directors of BDO USA, LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee (jk2, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 6/3/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 6/10/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 05/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Gaines, Jessica Kelly, Anthony Tse by Donald Roberts Reavey (Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Gaines, Jessica Kelly, Anthony Tse by Mark K Gyandoh (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Valerie Hawkins, Patrick Gaines, Anthony Tse, Jessica Kelly; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19333596.(Lechtzin, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BDO USA L.L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald R. Reavey