This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 07:43:44 (UTC).

GAGLIARDI v. COMPASS ONE HEALTHCARE et al

Case Summary

On December 03, 2021, Donna Gagliardi (“Plaintiff”), represented by Fernando I. Rivera of Console Mattiacci Law LLC, filed civil action against Compass One Healthcare, Morrison Healthcare LLC, and Compass Group USA Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief, including back and front pay, with compensatory and liquidated damages, for the Defendants’ alleged unlawful age discrimination. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of New Jersey with Judge Robert B. Kugler and Judge Sharon A. King presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “On or about February 9, 1981, Plaintiff was hired by Inspira Health Network (“Inspira”). In or around November of 2017, Inspira contracted with Defendants to provide the services that Plaintiff had previously provided for Inspira in the role of Director of Food and Nutrition. On September 17, 2019, Plaintiff (59) was notified that her position with Inspira was being eliminated and outsourced to Defendants. Plaintiff was advised by Joe Alessandrini (65) (“Alessandri”), Vice President of Clinic Services at Inspira, that Steven Blair (50) (“Blair”), Regional Director of Operations at Defendants, had a position for Plaintiff at Defendants. On September 18, 2019, in a text message to Blair, Plaintiff wrote that, “[y]esterday in my separation meeting, Alessandri stated that “[Defendants] had a position for me. If true, could you please provide me with the details?” Plaintiff also provided Blair with her email address. In response to Plaintiff’s September 18, 2019 text message, Blair told Plaintiff to call him the next day.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On September 19, 2019, in a phone call with Blair, Blair told Plaintiff that there was one (1) position available for Rehab Director at Mount Holly Long Term Care and that Plaintiff could apply for it, but there were many other applicants. Plaintiff was qualified for the Rehab Director position. On September 23, 2019, in a phone call with Christine Stewart (“Stewart), Talent Acquisition Recruiter at Defendants, Plaintiff was told that the Rehab Director position had been filled. Stewart also told Plaintiff that there were no other positions available in the area. Defendants failed to select Plaintiff for the Rehab Director position because of her age.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Since October 8, 2019, Plaintiff has applied for twenty-five (25) positions at Defendants for which she was qualified, including positions for which she was overqualified, but rejected because of her age. Defendants hired Denise Ferebee (35) (“Ferebee”) for the Food Service Director position. Plaintiff was more qualified for the Food Service Director position than Ferebee, who was significantly younger. Defendants failed to select Plaintiff for any of the positions for which she was qualified for and to which she applied because of her age.”

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged deals with violation of the Age Discrimination in Employment Act (“ADEA”), the second claim alleged deals with violation of the New Jersey Law Against Discrimination, (“LAD”) and the third claim alleged deals with violation of the Philadelphia Fair Practices Ordinance, (“PFPO”). 

 

In her prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to enjoin and permanently restrain the violations alleged; to award damages for back pay, front pay, and pre- and post-judgement interest, along with compensatory damages for Plaintiff’s past and future emotional distress; and such further relief as this Court deems appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-20338

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONNA GAGLIARDI

Defendants

COMPASS ONE HEALTHCARE

MORRISON HEALTHCARE, LLC

COMPASS GROUP USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDO I. RIVERA

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

110 Marter Ave. Suite 502

Moorestown, NJ 08057

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., COMPASS ONE HEALTHCARE, MORRISON HEALTHCARE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., COMPASS ONE HEALTHCARE, MORRISON HEALTHCARE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, Capitalize parties . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dd, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13020442) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Donna Gagliardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPASS GROUP USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MORRISON MANAGEMENT SPECIALISTS INC. DBA MORRISON HEALTHCARE INC. A GEORGIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDO I. RIVERA