This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:28:33 (UTC).

GAGE v. PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 GAGE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Michael A. Shipp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-20396

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS I. GAGE

Warren, NJ 07059

Defendants

PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY

AFFORDABLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC

GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC.

PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL J. JONES

Attorney at RIVKIN RADLER

21 Main Street, Court Plaza South, West Wing - Suite 158

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Golden State Claims Adjusters, Inc... (JONES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. JONES on behalf of GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC., PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC (JONES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC.. (JONES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AFFORDABLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC., PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Summonses sent to Plaintiff via USPS on 11/21/2019.(jmh). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(mg) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/21/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Golden State Claims Adjusters, Inc... (JONES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. JONES on behalf of GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC., PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC (JONES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/17/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC.. (JONES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AFFORDABLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC., PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Summonses sent to Plaintiff via USPS on 11/21/2019.(jmh). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 . (jmh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (mg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number NEW041081. (sms) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(mg) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.