This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 07:54:17 (UTC).

Gafcon, Inc. v. AECOM Caribe, LLP

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Gafcon, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AECOM Caribe, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gafcon, Inc.

Defendant

Aecom Caribe, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Floyd

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen PLLC

Suite 4700, 100 North Tryon St.

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Theodore Curtis Edwards, II

Attorney at The Banks Law Firm

P.O. Box 1430

Research Triangle Park, NC 27709

Jesse Huntsman Rigsby, IV

Attorney at The Banks Law Firm, P.A.

4309 Emperor Boulevard, Suite 225

Durham, NC 27703

 

Court Documents

23 #3

Exhibit C: AECOM's Reply Memorandum

23 #2

Exhibit B: Gafcon's Opposition Memorandum

23 #1

Exhibit A: AECOM's Memorandum Supporting Its Motion to Dismiss

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gafcon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: AECOM's Memorandum Supporting Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B: Gafcon's Opposition Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C: AECOM's Reply Memorandum)(Floyd, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#22

(#22) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Motions due by 5/18/2020. Mediation deadline set for 5/4/2020. Bench Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 2-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/29/19. (clc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by AECOM Caribe, LLP. (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES MOTION for Attorney Fees by AECOM Caribe, LLP. Replies due by 11/1/2019 (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Floyd, John) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#13

(#14) MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION for Attorneys Fees by Gafcon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Written Analysis)(Floyd, John) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (brl). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting with modification #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal/Complaint. Defendant Aecom Caribe, LLP shall have up to and including October 8, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/11/19. (mga) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (mga). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

4 #1

Appendix List of Corporate Parents for AECOM Caribe, LLP

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aecom Caribe, LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of Corporate Parents for AECOM Caribe, LLP)(Rigsby, Jesse) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Huntsman Rigsby, IV on behalf of Aecom Caribe, LLP (Rigsby, Jesse) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Curtis Edwards, II on behalf of Aecom Caribe, LLP (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to Adverse Party

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint and Exhibits

#1

(#6) ORDER granting with modification #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal/Complaint. Defendant Aecom Caribe, LLP shall have up to and including October 8, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/11/19. (mga) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (mga). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gafcon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: AECOM's Memorandum Supporting Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B: Gafcon's Opposition Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C: AECOM's Reply Memorandum)(Floyd, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Motions due by 5/18/2020. Mediation deadline set for 5/4/2020. Bench Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 2-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/29/19. (clc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by AECOM Caribe, LLP. (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES MOTION for Attorney Fees by AECOM Caribe, LLP. Replies due by 11/1/2019 (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Floyd, John) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION to Dismiss -- Request for Preliminary Hearing of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Gafcon, Inc.. Replies due by 10/28/2019 (Floyd, John) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Judicial Notice by Gafcon, Inc.. Replies due by 10/28/2019 (Floyd, John) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Gafcon, Inc.. Replies due by 10/28/2019 (Floyd, John) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gafcon, Inc. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION for Attorneys Fees by Gafcon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Written Analysis)(Floyd, John) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (brl). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by AECOM Caribe, LLP. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Miscellaneous Filing by Aecom Caribe, LLP. Letter, Documents and Certificate of Service for service upon Plaintiff's Counsel for Case Assignment Packet, Initial Scheduling Order and Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Form (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting with modification #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal/Complaint. Defendant Aecom Caribe, LLP shall have up to and including October 8, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/11/19. (mga) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (mga). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by Aecom Caribe, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Edwards, Theodore). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aecom Caribe, LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of Corporate Parents for AECOM Caribe, LLP)(Rigsby, Jesse) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Huntsman Rigsby, IV on behalf of Aecom Caribe, LLP (Rigsby, Jesse) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Curtis Edwards, II on behalf of Aecom Caribe, LLP (Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-16234. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4172300), filed by Aecom Caribe, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Edwards, Theodore) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.