This case was last updated from PACER on 02/13/2021 at 13:30:26 (UTC).

Gadra v. Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Gadra filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin C. Carlson and Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02355

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Martin C. Carlson

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathon Gadra

Coal Township, PA 17866

Defendants

John Wetzel

Pennsylvania Department of Corrections

Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER adopting #7 - ACCORDINGLY, on this 10th day of February 2021, upon independent review of the record and the applicable law, IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. The Court ADOPTS the January 15, 2021 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Carlson (Doc. No. 7); 2. Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 4) is GRANTED; and 3. Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. No. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs right to file an amended complaint, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, that corrects the pleading deficiencies identified in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/10/21. (dmn) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Jonathon Gadra - The plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, (Doc. 4), but IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs complaint be dismissed without prejudice to the plaintiff endeavoring to correct the defects cited in this report, provided that the plaintiff acts within 21 days of any dismissal order. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 15, 2021. (kjn) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/15/2021) (kjn). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Plaintiff is presently confined. For screening purposes only the Complaint is DEEMED filed. Service is deferred pending completion of legally-mandated screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 15, 2021 (kjn) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#5

(#5) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to superintendent and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 01/12/2021. (lp) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION/application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathon Gadra, NO CERTIFICATION ("the staff in this institution refuse to sign this"). (lg) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

3 #1

IFP (civil rights)

#3

(#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

2 #3

398 Forms

2 #2

Federal & Local Rules

2 #1

Instruction Sheet

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Federal & Local Rules) (lp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #3 398 Forms) (lp). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Jonathon Gadra.(lp) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER adopting #7 - ACCORDINGLY, on this 10th day of February 2021, upon independent review of the record and the applicable law, IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. The Court ADOPTS the January 15, 2021 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Carlson (Doc. No. 7); 2. Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 4) is GRANTED; and 3. Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. No. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs right to file an amended complaint, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, that corrects the pleading deficiencies identified in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/10/21. (dmn) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (CERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jonathon Gadra. (ep) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Jonathon Gadra - The plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, (Doc. 4), but IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs complaint be dismissed without prejudice to the plaintiff endeavoring to correct the defects cited in this report, provided that the plaintiff acts within 21 days of any dismissal order. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 15, 2021. (kjn) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/15/2021) (kjn). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Plaintiff is presently confined. For screening purposes only the Complaint is DEEMED filed. Service is deferred pending completion of legally-mandated screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 15, 2021 (kjn) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to superintendent and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 01/12/2021. (lp) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION/application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathon Gadra, NO CERTIFICATION ("the staff in this institution refuse to sign this"). (lg) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Federal & Local Rules) (lp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #3 398 Forms) (lp). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Jonathon Gadra.(lp) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant