This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:07:22 (UTC).

Gaddis v. National Collegiate Athletic Association et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Gaddis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Collegiate Athletic Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07334

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Versie Gaddis

Defendants

Big Ten Conference, Inc.

National Collegiate Athletic Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent P. Circelli

Attorney at CIRCELLI WALTER & YOUNG PLLC

500 East 4Th St., Suite 250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorney

Mark Steven Mester

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC., THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by VERSIE GADDIS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5517220) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent) Modified on 7/9/2019 (double docket text) (DJH). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#13

(#13) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (las, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mester on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff VERSIE GADDIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/23/2019. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

12 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by VERSIE GADDIS. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/26/2019. (Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#12

(#12) RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02792 (ls) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#11

(#11) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on November 6, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5536668), filed by Plaintiff VERSIE GADDIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (las, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02792 (ls) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on November 6, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 23. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mester on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by VERSIE GADDIS. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/26/2019. (Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff VERSIE GADDIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/23/2019. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5536668), filed by Plaintiff VERSIE GADDIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC., THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by VERSIE GADDIS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5517220) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent) Modified on 7/9/2019 (double docket text) (DJH). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.