This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 07:24:44 (UTC).

Gabriela Cabrera v. LF Endeavor, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Gabriela Cabrera filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against LF Endeavor, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00573

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriela Cabrera

Defendants

LF Endeavor, Inc.

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Richard Manning, Jr

Attorney at Manning Law APC

20062 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to LF Endeavor, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

15 #2

Exhibit Proof Of Service

15 #1

Declaration Entry of Default

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Cabrera, upon Defendant LF Endeavor, Inc. served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

13 #2

Declaration of Cabrera

13 #1

Declaration of JRM

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint no later than February 11, 2022. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REGARDING PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC ENUMERATED REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES THEREIN). The failure to comply with this Order in a particular case will result in a sanction of $300.00 payable to the clerk of the court within two weeks of Plaintiff being given notice of noncompliance and dismissal for lack of prosecution. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the Order and to achieve timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant LF Endeavor, Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32687163 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to LF Endeavor, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant LF Endeavor, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service) (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Cabrera, upon Defendant LF Endeavor, Inc. served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Cabrerato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Declaration of Cabrera)(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint no later than February 11, 2022. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REGARDING PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC ENUMERATED REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES THEREIN). The failure to comply with this Order in a particular case will result in a sanction of $300.00 payable to the clerk of the court within two weeks of Plaintiff being given notice of noncompliance and dismissal for lack of prosecution. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the Order and to achieve timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant LF Endeavor, Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32687163 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Richard Manning, Jr