This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 09:14:11 (UTC).

Gabriela Cabrera v. Mohamad K. Baba et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Gabriela Cabrera filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Mohamad K Baba. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00575

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,

Gabriela Cabrera

Defendants

MOHAMAD K. BABA, individually and as trustee of the MOHAMAD AND ABIR BABA FMAILY TRUST DATED JUNE 6, 2000

ABIR M. BABA, individually and as trustee of the MOHAMAD AND ABIR BABA FMAILY TRUST DATED JUNE 6, 2000

DOES 1-10 Inclusive

Mohamad K. Boba

Abir M. Baba

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Richard Manning, Jr

Attorney at Manning Law APC

20062 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Jack H Chammas

Attorney at Chammas Law Office

109 E. Harvard Street, Suite 305

Glendale, CA 91205

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32687357 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mohamad K. Boba. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Abir M. Baba. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER RE: ADA ACCESSIBILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#13

(#13) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Abir M. Baba answer now due 4/18/2022; Mohamad K. Boba answer now due 4/18/2022, filed by Defendants Abir M. Baba; Mohamad K. Boba.(Attorney Jack H Chammas added to party Abir M. Baba(pty:dft), Attorney Jack H Chammas added to party Mohamad K. Boba(pty:dft))(Chammas, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Abir M. Baba answer now due 4/18/2022; Mohamad K. Boba answer now due 4/18/2022, filed by Defendants Abir M. Baba; Mohamad K. Boba.(Attorney Jack H Chammas added to party Abir M. Baba(pty:dft), Attorney Jack H Chammas added to party Mohamad K. Boba(pty:dft))(Chammas, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE: ADA ACCESSIBILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Abir M. Baba. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mohamad K. Boba. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32687357 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party GABRIELA CABRERA, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less