This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2021 at 07:57:53 (UTC).

Gabriel Rivera v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Gabriel Rivera filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03876

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Rivera

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Athena Bao Nhi Nguyen

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Renia Zadourian

Attorney at Quill and Arrow Law Firm

10900 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement #12 , indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. By August 24, 2021, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs Complaint and Defendants Notice of Removal and finds that neither contain allegations which on their face plausibly establish that the amount incontroversy exceeds $75,000. Thus, the Court questions whether it has subject-matter jurisdiction over this action under 28 USC 1332(a). The parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, to be received by the Court no later than May 26, 2021, for why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The parties are encouraged to submit evidence of the amount in controversy as part of their response to this Order. Failure to timely respond to this order shall result in a remand without further warning. (lc) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for August 23, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Electronic Filing re Response in Support of Motion #11 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #13 , Notice of Settlement #12 e-mailed to Renia Zadourian (rzadourian@quillarrowlaw.com) bounced due to.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-5.4.1 Recipient address rejected: Access denied. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement #12 , indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. By August 24, 2021, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Memo of P&A)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs Complaint and Defendants Notice of Removal and finds that neither contain allegations which on their face plausibly establish that the amount incontroversy exceeds $75,000. Thus, the Court questions whether it has subject-matter jurisdiction over this action under 28 USC 1332(a). The parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, to be received by the Court no later than May 26, 2021, for why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The parties are encouraged to submit evidence of the amount in controversy as part of their response to this Order. Failure to timely respond to this order shall result in a remand without further warning. (lc) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for August 23, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court on 3/17/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Rivera. Filed in State Court on 2/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura, case number 56-2021-00550774-CU-BC-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-31254366 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Y. Jacobson