This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:34:58 (UTC).

Gabriel Investment Group, Inc. v. Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Gabriel Investment Group, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01244

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Appellant

Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.

Appellee

Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission

Trustee

U.S. Trustee

In Re

Gabriel Investment Group, Inc. and Gabriel GP, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Thomas Rice

Attorney at Pulman, Cappuccio, Pullen, Benson & Jones, LLP

2161 Nw Military Highway, Suite 400

San Antonio, TX 78213

Randall A. Pulman

Attorney at Pulman, Cappuccio, Pullen, Benson & Jones, LLP

2161 Nw Military Highway, Suite 400

San Antonio, TX 78213

Leslie Sara Hyman

Attorney at Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP

2161 Nw Military Hwy, Suite 400

San Antonio, TX 78213

Russell S. Post

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney St., Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010

David J. Beck

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010-2010

Appellee Attorneys

Cristina M. Moreno

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548 Capital Station

Austin, TX 78711

Matthew Bohuslav

Attorney at Texas Attorney General's Office

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Jason Bradley Binford

Attorney at Office of the Texas Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Mc 008

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 12/25/2020, (wg) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J. Beck on behalf of Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.. Attorney David J. Beck added to party Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.(pty:a) (Beck, David) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell S. Post on behalf of Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.. Attorney Russell S. Post added to party Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.(pty:a) (Post, Russell) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellee's designation of additional items to include in the record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of the Record on Appeal, #2 Individual Designations 19-52298, #3 Individual Designations 20-5010) (Lawson, Rob) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellant's designated record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of the Record on Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet 19-52298, #3 Individual Designations 19-52298, #4 Docket Sheet 20-5010, #5 Individual Designations 20-5010, #6 Transcript 20-5010) (Lawson, Rob) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy Judge's Memorandum/Opinion by Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Lawson, Rob) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Notification sent to TXW BK Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Orders on Appeal, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 List of Parties) (kcda) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Tyler Bohuslav

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason B. Binford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cristina M Moreno